Trustees LICHFIELD GOSPEL CHOIR
Charity Number: 1153553

Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERBO HUISMAN | Chair | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Iona Chisholm | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ford | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paterson | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Slater | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JONES | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
EMILY JANE BACON | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.