Governing document THE HARROGATE AND DISTRICT NATURALISTS' SOCIETY
Charity Number: 503860

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 1975, 26 APRIL 1978 AND 24 APRIL 2003. as amended on 10 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND DISSEMINATION OF NATURAL HISTORY KNOWLEDGE IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND ALSO TO DIRECT ITS ENERGIES TO SOME PRACTICAL FORM OF NATURE CONSERVATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HARROGATE AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.