Accounts and annual returns CHRIST REDEMPTION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1152802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 12 August 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 07 June 2023 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 07 June 2023 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 July 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 22 July 2022 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 August 2021 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required