Accounts and annual returns AID BUKAVU EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1154177
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2017 13 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required