Financial history BILAD AL SHAAM

Charity number: 1155195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.69k £9.92k £15.01k £3.16k £2.73k
Total expenditure £27.14k £6.65k £34.76k £20.29k £18.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A