Accounts and annual returns WINNIES PRE SCHOOL (WESTERHAM) LTD

Charity number: 1153169
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 03 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 28 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 28 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 23 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 23 March 2015 On Time