Financial history LIVING WATERS EUROPE

Charity number: 1152890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £60.55k £67.83k £85.71k £229.18k £151.20k
Total expenditure £79.38k £71.95k £87.72k £183.52k £157.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A