Accounts and annual returns CARDIFF CONSORTIUM (CHARITIES)

Charity number: 1153900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required