Financial history FUSION HEALTH AND WELL BEING

Charity number: 1153370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £125.74k £277.09k £233.44k £901.19k £329.93k
Total expenditure £98.40k £129.51k £164.69k £244.56k £359.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.50k £47.56k N/A £36.45k £34.43k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £832.28k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £9.52k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £59.39k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £244.26k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.06k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £296 N/A