Financial history ACORNS PRESCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1156060
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.41k £64.46k £92.20k £85.84k £102.58k
Total expenditure £49.74k £50.59k £63.31k £61.78k £78.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A