Accounts and annual returns CATHEDRAL PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 503966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 September 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 July 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 October 2022 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 March 2022 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required