Financial history FRIENDS OF KIRK FENTON

Charity Number: 1154660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.55k £500 £2.94k £13.06k £11.93k
Total expenditure £5.06k £5.34k £3.13k £7.29k £12.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A