Financial history FRESHFORD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1153406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £79.77k £91.86k £85.71k £90.83k £112.38k
Total expenditure £81.37k £79.72k £97.87k £95.58k £109.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.50k £49.82k £53.23k £54.47k £59.76k