Financial history VICTORY WORSHIP CENTRE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1154385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £188.17k £192.32k £285.33k £234.85k £244.09k
Total expenditure £121.23k £98.31k £128.06k £119.26k £133.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A