Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM TRUST

Charity Number: 1156226
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 17 March 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 07 July 2016 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 03 May 2016 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required