Accounts and annual returns MY FOREVER HOME ANIMAL RESCUE (MFH) LTD

Charity Number: 1157356
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 November 2021 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 November 2021 512 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required