Trustees FRIENDS OF THE RIVER CRANE ENVIRONMENT

Charity Number: 1155971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Denise Young Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Catherine Mary Wyatt Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
ALISON CLAIRE HORWOOD Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
ALAN JOHN CHARLES Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
Jane Marguerite Satchwell Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Joe Pecorelli Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
ROB GRAY Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record