Financial history WANSTEAD AND WOODFORD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1153877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.23k £6.62k £6.62k £8.37k £21.59k
Total expenditure £30.99k £8.60k £8.60k £9.00k £22.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A