Accounts and annual returns ATHERTON AND TYLDESLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 504080
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 30 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 30 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 06 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 May 2008 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time