Accounts and annual returns THE LIVINGSTONE APOSTOLIC FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1157998
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 February 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 May 2022 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 May 2022 114 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required