Trustees OLIVE COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity number: 1155574
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE CHEETHAM B.A.HONS | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANN DAWBER | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ken Livingstone | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steve Hough | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Booth | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.