Financial history LLANFAIRFECHAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 504150
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £10.71k £11.58k £48.23k £176.49k £13.77k
Total expenditure £10.01k £7.61k £36.45k £166.30k £14.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A