Financial history STEP UP TO SERVE

Charity number: 1154588
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £758.05k £966.70k £861.32k £960.07k £898.12k
Total expenditure £826.49k £936.38k £885.62k £961.85k £914.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £233.39k £259.43k £253.33k £303.96k £300.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £206.00k £335.27k £316.94k £960.07k £233.42k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £552.05k £631.43k £544.38k £0 £664.70k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £826.49k £936.38k £885.62k £961.85k £914.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.04k £13.59k £13.06k £11.08k £20.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0