Trustees ISSABELLES APPEAL

Charity number: 1155859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW FUTTER Chair 25 October 2013
None on record
Simon Kelly Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Eleanor Keeley Thompson Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Emma Doolan Trustee 28 July 2023
None on record
Maisie Nolan Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Natalie Kelly Trustee 18 February 2020
None on record
JENNY VERNON Trustee 25 October 2013
None on record