Accounts and annual returns PECULIAR PEOPLE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1155178
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 18 November 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 19 November 2024 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 27 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 06 October 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 03 January 2023 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 15 November 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 15 November 2021 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window