Trustees BR CLASS 8 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST
Charity Number: 1154700

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR ROYSTON TUCKLEY | Chair | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Oliver | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phil Sanderson | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr Steve Wakeland | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.