Financial history LITTLE JOHN'S HOUSE

Charity Number: 1156332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.30k £42.11k £73.82k £62.55k £79.83k
Total expenditure £63.82k £200.68k £69.10k £105.37k £97.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A