Accounts and annual returns PEMBREY MOUNTAIN TRUST

Charity Number: 1155723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2023 01 April 2025 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2022 10 May 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2021 03 May 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2020 11 May 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2020 Not Required