Accounts and annual returns LIONS MMA (BRADFORD)

Charity Number: 1154647
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 06 April 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Annual return 31 October 2017 11 March 2019 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 March 2019 192 days late