Accounts and annual returns NORTH NORFOLK EXHIBITION PROJECT

Charity number: 1156869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 October 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 19 October 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 19 October 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 October 2020 20 August 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2020 Not Required