Trustees BRITISH DRESSAGE
Charity number: 1155352

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Day | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Pullem | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Moody | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lane | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Thomas Payne | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy-Anne Ormrod | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HOMEWOOD | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDY HARVEY | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE GODFREY | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER STORR | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.