Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, HIS DWELLING PLACE CONNECTIONS

Charity number: 1154704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.49k £9.89k £8.53k £12.84k £4.85k
Total expenditure £16.53k £7.16k £7.97k £8.38k £7.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A