Accounts and annual returns THE SIR RICHARD ARKWRIGHT STATUE APPEAL

Charity Number: 1157136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 February 2020 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 08 September 2017 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required