Financial history INTOUCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158532
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.72k £65.24k £36.82k £47.48k £53.01k
Total expenditure £66.52k £34.24k £29.36k £21.80k £28.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.53k N/A N/A