Financial history GUNTON WOODLAND BURIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1156621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £91.95k £110.95k £155.80k £135.93k £184.48k
Total expenditure £132.43k £88.88k £114.58k £176.30k £175.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A £3.50k £8.00k £4.36k