Trustees EYE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTEER CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1156968
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHNNIE WALKER Chair 22 January 2014
None on record
MICHEAL SMITH Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
MICHELLE SALAZAR Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
MOIRA COOK Trustee 10 December 2021
EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: 53 days late
caroline pickering Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
DAVID PEARCE Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
SUSAN WHYMARK Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record