Accounts and annual returns XXIV BLACKBIRDS

Charity Number: 1157046
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On Time