Trustees IDOLRICH THEATRE ROTTO

Charity number: 1155824
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dan Scott Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
Cindy Oswin Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Hojlund Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Pat Scott Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
GINA FEITELSON Trustee 18 February 2014
None on record
MAYA EVANS Trustee 04 February 2014
None on record
JONATHAN ALTARAS Trustee 04 February 2014
None on record