Financial history QUBA-E-SIDDIQUE SILSILA - E - NAQSHBANDIA, MUJADADIA, SAIFIA, CHISHTIA, QADRIA, SUHRWARDIA

Charity number: 1155908
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £717 £402 £2 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.86k £4.52k £3.05k £3.49k £6.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A