Trustees Healthwatch Bristol, North Somerset & South Gloucestershire
Charity number: 1158487

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGINA JEANETTE BIGG | Chair | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Dolton | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Geary | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peninah Achieng-Kindberg | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy Evans | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RAQUEL BENZAL | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Whittington | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.