Financial history FISHABILITY UK

Charity number: 1157900
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.48k £3.32k £2.18k £11.56k £1.25k
Total expenditure £3.29k £4.04k £2.97k £3.12k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A