Financial history CARLEEN CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1158216
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £42.86k £50.96k £29.09k £4 £0
Total expenditure £42.69k £47.94k £32.47k £1.27k £8.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £18.54k £9.09k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £9.09k N/A N/A