Accounts and annual returns DENTON PARK ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504525
Charity reporting is overdue by 1621 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
Annual return 03 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days
Annual return 03 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days
Annual return 03 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days
Annual return 03 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1621 days
Accounts and TAR 03 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1621 days