Accounts and annual returns SMILING FACES CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156514
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 February 2017 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 April 2016 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 21 April 2016 81 days late