Accounts and annual returns RHYL FLOOD RELIEF

Charity number: 1157132
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2017 01 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 20 July 2017 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2015 18 December 2015 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 18 December 2015 18 days late