Financial history WATFORD ABC

Charity number: 1156899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.80k £18.60k £21.29k £22.03k £13.47k
Total expenditure £17.76k £8.79k £17.53k £19.55k £12.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.20k N/A N/A N/A