Accounts and annual returns THE WARSTOCK AND BILLESLEY DETACHED YOUTHWORK PROJECT (YOUTHWISE)

Charity number: 1156830
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time