Accounts and annual returns CLIMBERS AGAINST CANCER

Charity number: 1158181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 December 2023 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 December 2023 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window