Accounts and annual returns CARRATY BOTTOM EQUINE RESCUE AND RETIREMENT

Charity number: 1158245
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 March 2025 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2025 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 March 2025 405 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 February 2025 744 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 March 2025 770 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2025 1107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 March 2025 1135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days