Financial history THE FRIENDS OF KNAPTOFT

Charity number: 504685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.63k £2.74k £3.40k £3.13k £4.50k
Total expenditure £1.99k £2.62k £3.42k £2.96k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A